This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 00:29:14 (UTC).

MICHELLE ALEJANDRA GOMEZ -v- EDGAR ALFONSO GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MICHELLE ALEJANDRA GOMEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDGAR ALFONSO GOMEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Thornton-Harris, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3344

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Thornton-Harris, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ, MICHELLE ALEJANDRA

Respondent

GOMEZ, EDGAR ALFONSO

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 01/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: Petition, Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $355.00; Total Payments and Credits: $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA Filed; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSeparate Property Declaration Filed; Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Family Law Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS: FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketCase Transferred to New Department; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS,PETITION,UCCJEA,IE DECL,PROP DECL FILED AS TO EDGAR A GOMEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/09. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketComment:; Comment: COPY OF DENIED FEE WVR,FW-008 MAILED TO PTNR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Fees and Costs is Denied; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MICHELLE A GOMEZ IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Denied Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHELLE A GOMEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed; Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHELLE A GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA filed; Comment: DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant