This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 18:24:39 (UTC).

MICHELE WHITFIELD-SQUIRES -v- KEITH SQUIRES

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 MICHELE WHITFIELD-SQUIRES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEITH SQUIRES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Burdick, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0569

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Burdick, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITFIELD-SQUIRES, MICHELE P

Respondent

SQUIRES, KEITH

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

**FL - Portal Minute Order

06/23/2021: **FL - Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

07/29/2021: **FL - Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

10/29/2021: **FL - Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

01/13/2022: **FL - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialSQUIRES, KEITH; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialWHITFIELD-SQUIRES, MICHELE P; Total Financial Assessment: $140.50; Total Payments and Credits: $140.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $108.75; Total Payments and Credits: $108.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Burdick, John; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /Status of FL Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Appointment time: 9:00 AM Parties are to check in with the bailiff in Department M4 prior to and after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: by mail, FL-150, SB-598

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Proof of Service: Per Local Rule of the Court 321 the court cannot accept for filing any document that contains white out or correction tape. This document should be signed by the person who effected service, not by the respondent. #4b should list the full address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketInformational Check List Provided (FL200); Comment: INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO MICHELE P WHITFIELD-SQUIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHELE P WHITFIELD-SQUIRES FOR FIRST FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHELE P WHITFIELD-SQUIRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHELE P WHITFIELD-SQUIRES IS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCommunity and Quasi Community Property Declaration Filed; Comment: COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF MICHELE P WHITFIELD-SQUIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant