This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 01:24:37 (UTC).

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. -v- ACTIVE SHEET METAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACTIVE SHEET METAL, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3684

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Defendants

SCHAMBER ELECTRIC & SONS, INC

DYNAMIC PLUMBING COMMERCIAL, INC

DW TRIM, INC

AZ COUNTERTOPS, INC

ACTIVE SHEET METAL, INC

Builder Services Group, Inc

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS, INC

FIRST QUALITY PAINTING, INC

BSA FRAMING, INC

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC, INC

FIRE SPRINKLER SYSTEMS, INC

FIBER CARE BATHS, INC

PACIFIC MASONRY WALLS, INC

VINTAGE DESIGN, INC

WESTERN PACIFIC ROOFING CORP

CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC

VINTAGE ROOFING AND SOLAR CO. INC

MATRIX SURFACES, INC

ULTRA WALL, INC

VP CONCRETE, INC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

Attorney at FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

MCMAHON LAW FIRM

Attorney at MCMAHON LAW FIRM

Other Attorneys

HUGUENIN KAHN LLP

Attorney at HUGUENIN KAHN LLP

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

Attorney at MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

 

Court Documents

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

05/28/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

05/17/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

04/30/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

04/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

03/30/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

03/25/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Summons Issued on

04/29/2021: Summons Issued on

Cross-Complaint Filed

04/27/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed

Answer Filed

04/27/2021: Answer Filed

Answer Filed

04/12/2021: Answer Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

03/25/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

03/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialMERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-34742; MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; $4.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialMERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Transaction Assessment; $4.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialMERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-32375; MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialMERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Transaction Assessment; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $3.00 cc for fax fee paid by PLA for fax sent on 03/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialURBAN CONCRETE, INC.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-23068; southern california legal support services inc; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketBalance Due on Case; Comment: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialBuilder Services Group, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialURBAN CONCRETE, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialFIRE SPRINKLER SYSTEMS, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialMERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: $442.27; Total Payments and Credits: $442.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VINTAGE ROOFING AND SOLAR CO is a litigant

Latest cases where DYNAMIC PLUMBING COMMERCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MATRIX SURFACES, INC is a litigant