This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 01:02:22 (UTC).

Mendoza -v- Baird et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Baird. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, David A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3908

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, David A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Mendoza, Raymundo

an individual

Defendants

Baird, William

Baird, Ryan

an individual

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez-Ventura, Ivan Miguel

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

12/07/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

12/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

12/07/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

01/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

01/13/2022: Notice of Hearing Sent

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Williams, David A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialMendoza, Raymundo; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2022-03169; Mendoza, Raymundo; $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialMendoza, Raymundo; Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialMendoza, Raymundo; Transaction Assessment; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: Filed by plaintiff Raymundo Mendoza filed 01/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • FinancialMendoza, Raymundo; Total Financial Assessment: $390.00; Total Payments and Credits: $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $390.00 visa payment recieved on 01/13/2022 for First Appearance and Fax filling fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: Filed by plaintiff Raymundo Mendoza. Filed against defendants William Baird, Ryan Baird, and Does 1 to 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M.