This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 11:13:18 (UTC).

Medel et al -v- Gonzalez et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Medel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gonzalez. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. and Wilfred J Schneider, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4781

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

Wilfred J Schneider, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medel, Hermenegildo

Aquino, Rosa

Medel, Melissa Emily

Defendants

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Gonzalez, Mark A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berkovich, Gary

 

Court Documents

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

* Public *

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $439.00; Payment: $439.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $4.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-40088

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $4.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Hermenegildo Medel; Comments: $4.00 CC Fax Fees paid on 07/06/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S32 - SBJC; Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Filed By: Hermenegildo Medel; Comments: Without Prejudice Filed by Pla Hermenegildo Medel, Et. Al. on Complaint filed 11/15/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: Complaint filed by Hermenegildo Medel, Rosa Aquino, Melissa Emily Medel on 11/15/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-65763

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Hermenegildo Medel, Rosa Aquino, Melissa Medel; Comments: filed by all plaintiffs filed against defendant mark a. gonzalez on complaint filed 11/15/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Hermenegildo Medel, Rosa Aquino, Melissa Medel; Comments: filed by all plaintiffs filed on 11/15/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Hermenegildo Medel, Rosa Aquino, Melissa Medel; Comments: $435.00 cc paid on 11/15/21 for filing fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less