This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 07:28:50 (UTC).

MCMILLAN HINSON -v- TORRE et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 MCMILLAN HINSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TORRE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sachs, Michael A and Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0036

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sachs, Michael A

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMILLAN HINSON, DIANE

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MYERS & SON CONSTRUCTION

TORRE, JOSE ANTONIO

Myers & Sons Construction L.P

Myers & Sons Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacoby & Meyers Attorneys LLP

Attorney at Jacoby & Meyers Attorneys LLP

Defendant Attorney

Bullard Brown & Beal

Attorney at Bullard Brown & Beal

 

Court Documents

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

01/19/2022: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/29/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/29/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/29/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

10/29/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

10/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

10/15/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

10/15/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

09/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

05/25/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

05/19/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Answer Filed

06/16/2021: Answer Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

04/29/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

04/29/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

03/23/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

03/23/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

03/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

03/23/2021: Complaint Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Hearing Re: Set trial/related dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 10/29/21 minute order/ITSC order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed; Comment: of Myers & Sons Construction on Complaint filed 3/23/2021 by Plaintiff Diane Mcmillan Hinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialMyers & Sons Construction L.P.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-36866; Myers & Sons Construction L.P.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialMyers & Sons Construction L.P.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialMyers & Sons Construction L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTORRE, JOSE ANTONIO; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialMCMILLAN HINSON, DIANE; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 CHECK PAID ON 4/29/21 FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYERS & SONS ? GRIFFITH A JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where MYERS & SONS CONSTRUCTION LP is a litigant