This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 01:33:11 (UTC).

Maya -v- Amazon.com Services LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Maya filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amazon com Services LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are James R Baxter and Baxter, James R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0973

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

James R Baxter

Baxter, James R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maya, Ricardo

Defendants

Amazon.com Services LLC

AMAZON

CSC

LAYWERS INCORPORATING SERVICE

 

Court Documents

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

* Public *

Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

* Public *

Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: $5,000; Department: Department B1 - Barstow; Judge: Baxter, James R; Court Reporter: Electronically, Recorded

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Plaintiff's Claim; Type: Action; Description: 10/11/2021 Owed money from a deactivated Amazon seller's account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less