This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 13:21:12 (UTC).

MARISSA VIEIRA -v- DILLON VIEIRA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MARISSA VIEIRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DILLON VIEIRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Minton, James Bruce, Cabrera, Carlos, Bovee, Guy, James Bruce Minton, Rodrigo, Aruna P and Garcia, Damian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0228

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Minton, James Bruce

Cabrera, Carlos

Bovee, Guy

James Bruce Minton

Rodrigo, Aruna P

Garcia, Damian

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

VIEIRA, MARISSA A

Not Yet Classified and Respondents

VIEIRA, DILLON A

VIEIRA, MARISSA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CKB Vienna LLP

 

Court Documents

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

XSPOUSE CALCULATION

**Portal Minute Order

FCS RECOMMENDATION REPORT

**Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

02/28/2023

HearingType: Request For Order Re:: FCS (11/19/21) Counsel/Petitioner may appear via CourtCall; Department: Department B3 - Barstow; Judge: Minton, James Bruce; Court Reporter: Foster, Valerie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $978.88; Payment: $978.88; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $19.80; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: BS-2022-0022669

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $19.80; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Document Received; Filed By: MARISSA VIEIRA; Comments: Fax: Findings and Order after hearings and attachments.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Request For Order Re:: RFO/FCS(111921); Department: Department B3 - Barstow; Judge: Minton, James Bruce; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Foster, Valerie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Re-referred to Family Court Services.; Comments: The parties have been advised that the case has been referred to Family Court Services and to cooperate fully with the Child Custody Recommending Counselor during all stages of the mediation/evaluation. Custodial parent(s) shall make children available at all times requested by Counselor.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Re-referral to Family Court Services filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Document Received; Filed By: DILLON VIEIRA; Comments: mail: proof of electronic service , responsive decl to request for order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Filed By: DILLON VIEIRA; Comments: FL-320, Responsive Declaration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
02/01/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $525.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: 20210201-0128

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $525.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Petition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comments: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 210201-0128-EZ LFG/ 435.00 MFL/ 60.00 PAYMT 210201-0128-EZ CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210201-0128-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER 1UX70157LB891241

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes; Comments: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Family Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comments: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Declaration Under UCCJEA filed; Comments: DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Request for Order Filed re:; Filed By: MARISSA VIEIRA; Comments: REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY MARISSA A VIEIRA RE: CS(020121).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Turbo Court Transaction ID#:; Comments: E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 1UX70157LB891241V

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Financial Statement(s) Filed; Comments: FINANCIAL STATEMENT (SIMPLIFIED) AS TO MARISSA A VIEIRA FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less