This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 21:03:51 (UTC).

MARESHA BROOKS -v- JERMAINE BROOKS

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 MARESHA BROOKS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JERMAINE BROOKS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3746

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROOKS, MARESHA

Respondent

BROOKS, JERMAINE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS: FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketService Tab Updated; Comment: default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDecl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed; Comment: prelim/final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialBROOKS, JERMAINE; Counter Payment; Receipt # BS-2021-0013326; BROOKS, JERMAINE; $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialBROOKS, JERMAINE; Transaction Assessment; $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 11/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $1.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketFee Payment; Comment: FEE PAYMENT 191106-0310-CS FFS/ 1.61 TAX/ 0.12 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARESHA BROOKS FOR 1ST FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARESHA BROOKS IS GRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARESHA BROOKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant