This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/06/2022 at 15:03:21 (UTC).

Marciniak -v- Romero et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Marciniak filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Romero. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James R Baxter. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1424

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

James R Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marciniak, Richard

Defendants

Romero, Bonnie

Silva, Mary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOUZANE, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

* Public *

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Documents Received:; Comments: pos and ntc of renewal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Richard Marciniak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: JOHN BOUZANE; Comments: file in barstow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE/NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: BS-2022-0015632

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Richard Marciniak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Richard Marciniak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Pursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.