This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 18:06:03 (UTC).

Mancino -v- Enterprise Rent - A- Car of Los Angeles, LLCet al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Mancino filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Enterprise Rent - A- Car of Los Angeles, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5517

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mancino, Michael

Defendants

Enterprise Rent - A- Car of Los Angeles, LLC

National Car Rental

Does 1 through 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELGUM, FRY & VAN ALLEN

Attorney at BELGUM, FRY & VAN ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

06/01/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/01/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

06/10/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/10/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

06/21/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-44408; Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Transaction Assessment; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; Mancino, Michael; Enterprise Rent - A- Car of Los Angeles, LLC; National Car Rental; Does 1 through 30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $3.00 mc Paid on 07/30/21 for Fax Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: With Prejudice Filed by PLA Michael Mancino on Complaint Filed on 06/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-34815; atty Belgum, Fry & Van Allen; $447.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Transaction Assessment; $12.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialMancino, Michael; Total Financial Assessment: $450.77; Total Payments and Credits: $450.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $447.77 master card paid on 06.10.21 for First appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CAR RENTAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS is a litigant