This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 05:21:43 (UTC).

Mallick et al -v- Damian et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Mallick filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Damian. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4728

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mallick, Veronica

Mallick, Patrick

Defendants

Does 1 to 25

Damian, Juan

Dewone Damper, Lewis

Damian, Marcelina

Victor Valley Transit

Damian, Ernesto

Snape Damian, Katrina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shemtoub, Michael

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

03/18/2021: Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

03/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

03/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

03/18/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

03/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

03/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

Notice of Hearing Sent

03/18/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

**CV - Portal Minute Order

09/20/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

09/20/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

11/19/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

11/19/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

11/19/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/20/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

12/20/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court-Ordered - Before Trial; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Failure to Appear (All Parties); Comment: Status of Service/Dismissal of All Unserved Defendants/Potential TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of 11/19/21 minute order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Status of Service/Dismissal of all Unserved Defendants/Potential TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 09/20/21 Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialMallick, Veronica; Fee Waiver; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialMallick, Veronica; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialMallick, Veronica; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victor Valley Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL SHEMTOUB