This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 04:52:34 (UTC).

Main Street Acquisition Corp. -v- Muro, Sr.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Main Street Acquisition Corp filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Muro, Sr. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, David A. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6665

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, David A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Main Street Acquisition Corp

Defendant

Muro, Robert L, Sr

Assignees

GLCS, LLC

Gold Line Credit Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson & Kennard

Attorney at Nelson & Kennard

Assignee Attorneys

Law Offices of Edward T Weber

Attorney at Law Offices of Edward T Weber

Sipes, Mike Kittell

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

03/17/2021: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

03/17/2021: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

03/17/2021: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

06/18/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/23/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment must have original Notice and a copy of application attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialGLCS, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-36668; The 704 Group, LLC- Credigy File Cost Account; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialGLCS, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-36667; The 704 Group, LLC- Credigy File Cost Account; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialGLCS, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialGLCS, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialMain Street Acquisition Corp.; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Purchased. Number of Pages:; Comment: 2; Certified copy of Application for Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Party; Names; Main Street Acquisition Corp.; Muro, Robert L, Sr.; GLCS, LLC; Gold Line Credit Services, Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Main Street Acquisition Corp.; GLCS, LLC; Gold Line Credit Services, Inc.; Awarded Against: Muro, Robert L, Sr.; Amount; Damages: $7,213.89; Costs: $45.00; Other: $6,814.34; Other Comment: Interest after Judgment; Total: $14073.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialGLCS, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $86.00; Total Payments and Credits: $86.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialMain Street Acquisition Corp.; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $45 Check paid on 6/18/2021 for Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comment: CIVVS1103365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: $45.00/$7,213.89/$6,814.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLCS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES MIKE KITTELL