This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/01/2022 at 17:36:46 (UTC).

Main Street Acquisition Corp. -v- Contreras

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Main Street Acquisition Corp filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Contreras. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald J Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2618

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald J Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Main Street Acquisition Corp.

Defendant

Contreras, Roberta

Assignees

GLCS, LLC

Gold Line Credit Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson & Kennard

Attorney at Nelson & Kennard

Assignee Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD T. WEBER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD T. WEBER

Sipes, Michael K

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Writ of Execution Issued - Orange

* Public *

Proof of Service Filed

* Public *

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $166.00; Payment: $126.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $40.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-40021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $40.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $40.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued - Orange; Filed By: GLCS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comments: 171.85/0.00/181.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service Filed; Filed By: Main Street Acquisition Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $41.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-15068

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-15065

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $41.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Certified Copy Purchased. Number of Pages:; Filed By: GLCS, LLC; Comments: 2 Application for and Renewal of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action; Description: Original Judgment Entered 03/07/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: Gold Line Credit Services, Inc.; Comments: 45.00/3,735.77/2,762.42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: GLCS, LLC; Comments: $45 Check paid on 3/7/2022 for Filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: GLCS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comments: CIVDS1207327

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLCS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant