This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 18:16:56 (UTC).

Lodolce -v- Amazon.com, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Lodolce filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4708

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lodolce, Sara Jean Marie

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc

Amazon.com Services, Inc

Pope, Malcom

a corporation

a Delaware corporation

Amazon

a California resident

Does 1-20

Does 2-20

Amazon.com Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GILLEON LAW FIRM

Attorney at THE GILLEON LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

08/25/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

08/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

08/25/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

09/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

09/21/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

10/15/2021: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed; Comment: Naming Doe #1 on complaint filed 08/25/21 by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialLodolce, Sara Jean Marie; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-55103; Lodolce, Sara Jean Marie; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialLodolce, Sara Jean Marie; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 Check for first appearance fee paid by PLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialLodolce, Sara Jean Marie; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: Filed by Sara Jean Marie Lodolce Against Defendants on 08/25/21 on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLCARE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC. DBA FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant