This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/04/2022 at 14:27:08 (UTC).

Linda Maestas -v- Paul Maestas

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Linda Maestas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Paul Maestas. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Guy Bovee and Bovee, Guy. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1642

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Guy Bovee

Bovee, Guy

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Maestas, Linda Ann

Maestas, Paul Steven

 

Court Documents

**FL - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2021
View Court Documents

HearingType: Hearing on Domestic Violence: FILED BY LINDA 11/22/21; Department: Department B4 - Barstow; Judge: Bovee, Guy; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021

DocketFile Type: This order shall expire at midnight on; Comments: 12/15/2024.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021

DocketFile Type: Restraining Order After Hearing Filed-Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Filed By: Linda Maestas; Comments: Temp Ordr, Request, Ntc of hrg, blank Response

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: Paul Maestas; Comments: Response to DVRO must be served before filing with the court. Please have response served and resubmit original response with proof of service to the court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Domestic Violence; Type: Action; Description: DV Prevention w/o Minor Children

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Filed (Domestic Violence Prevention); Filed By: Linda Maestas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order Filed - Granted in Part; Filed By: Linda Maestas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketFile Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketFile Type: Document(s) Placed in File; Comments: DV130 ROAH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less