This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 21:58:07 (UTC).

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company -v- Morales Amaro et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Morales Amaro. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7863

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Defendants

Morales Amaro, Joaquin Alberto

J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc

an individual

a Georgia Corporation

Does 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenberg, Gary Allen

Defendant Attorney

Haight Brown & Bonesteel

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel

 

Court Documents

Trial Setting Conference

01/12/2022: Trial Setting Conference

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/12/2022: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

01/11/2022: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Notice

09/20/2021: Notice

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

09/15/2021: Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

09/15/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

09/15/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice Returning Documents

09/13/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

09/09/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer Filed

09/09/2021: Answer Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

08/30/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

07/26/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/12/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Summons Issued and Filed

07/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/25/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/25/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

06/25/2021: Complaint Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: Filed by all Defendants on complaint filed 011122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialJ.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-55722; InfoTrack US, Inc; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialMorales Amaro, Joaquin Alberto; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-55721; InfoTrack US, Inc; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialMorales Amaro, Joaquin Alberto; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialMorales Amaro, Joaquin Alberto; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-55720; InfoTrack US, Inc; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $240 1st app fee per defendant and $150 jury fees $630 total

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketBalance Paid on Case; Comment: $240 per defendant 1st app fee $480 total

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comment: Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport and Joaquin Alberto Morales notice of posting jury fee's

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialLiberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Documents with correction tape or fluid cannot be accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialJ.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialMorales Amaro, Joaquin Alberto; Total Financial Assessment: $390.00; Total Payments and Credits: $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialLiberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $240.00 CK paid on 07/12/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A Georgia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where JB Hunt Transport, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenberg, Gary Allen