This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 18:50:11 (UTC).

Leto -v- McHenryet al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Leto filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against McHenry. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8296

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Leto, Christopher

an individual

Defendants

McHenry, David Lee

Victor Valley Transit Authority

an individual

a California corporation

Does 1 to 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

RAMEY LAW PC

Attorney at RAMEY LAW PC

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

10/01/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

10/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

10/01/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

11/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

11/09/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

11/29/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/29/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Answer Filed

01/05/2022: Answer Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

01/19/2022: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Answer Filed

02/02/2022: Answer Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialVictor Valley Transit Authority; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-08728; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialVictor Valley Transit Authority; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 Check paid on 2.08.22 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: Filed by defendant Victor Valley Transit Authority on 2.02.22 to complaint filed 10.01.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialMcHenry, David Lee; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-01982; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialMcHenry, David Lee; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check paid on 1/11/22 for first app fees

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialLeto, Christopher; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: filed by plaintiff Christopher Leto, filed 11/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialVictor Valley Transit Authority; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialMcHenry, David Lee; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialLeto, Christopher; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 credit card paid on 11/9/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: filed by plaintiff Christopher Leto, filed against defendants on complaint filed 10/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victor Valley Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant