This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 06:34:54 (UTC).

Kattar -v- Van Meter et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Kattar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Van Meter. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sachs, Michael A and Michael A Sachs. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3738

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sachs, Michael A

Michael A Sachs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kattar, Cambria

Defendants

Van Meter, Tyler

Van Meter, Steven

Does 1 to 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez, Roger William

 

Court Documents

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S28 - SBJC; Judge: Sachs, Michael A; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Filed By: Cambria Kattar; Comments: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $445.80; Payment: $445.80; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $445.80; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-05136

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $10.80; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Cambria Kattar; Comments: filed by plaintiff Cambria Kattar, filed 1/26/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 12/9/21 Complaint filed by Cambria Kattar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Filed By: Cambria Kattar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Cambria Kattar; Comments: $447.80 credit card paid on 1/26/22 for first appearance, fax, copies, postage

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Cambria Kattar; Comments: filed by plainitff Cambria Kattar, filed against defendants on complaint filed 12/9/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ ROGER WILLIAM