This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 16:39:05 (UTC).

KAORU KANAYAMA -v- DANIEL KLOOSTER

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 KAORU KANAYAMA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL KLOOSTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Suber, Shannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9512

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

Judge Details

Judge

Suber, Shannon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KANAYAMA, KAORU

Respondent

KLOOSTER, DANIEL J

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN JOHN HOLOHAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN JOHN HOLOHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAmended Family Law Petition Filed; Comment: 1ST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued; Comment: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Suber, Shannon; Comment: CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE SHANNON SUBER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: VERONICA SALAMANCA COURT REPORTER EVA ARAMBULA;13054 BAILIFF: T TERBEST - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRIAN HOLOHAN MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KAORU KANAYAMA, DANIEL J KLOOSTER - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. 09:35 AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : - COURT FINDS: NO SERVICE. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: ORDER OF THE COURT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketInformational Check List Provided (FL200); Comment: INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO KAORU KANAYAMA, DANIEL J KLOOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Resolution Status Conference; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE SJD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS OF FILING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191122-0289; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketInformational Check List Provided (FL200); Comment: INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO KAORU KANAYAMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA filed; Comment: DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 191122-0289-CK LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT 191122-0289-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3798

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant