This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 18:31:34 (UTC).

Juarez et al -v- 99 Cents Only Stores LLCet al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Juarez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1931

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juarez, Isabel

Vasquez, Isaias

Vasquez, Stephanie

Vazquez, Isaias, Jr

an individual

Vazquez, Isaias, Sr.

Defendants

99 Cents Only Stores LLC

Number Holdings, Inc

A California Limited Liability Corporation

A Delaware Corporation

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lombardo Law Firm

Attorney at Lombardo Law Firm

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

09/23/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

09/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

09/23/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

09/23/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

Notice Returning Documents

10/21/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

10/21/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Amended Complaint Filed

11/10/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

11/10/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

Request for Action Filed

11/17/2021: Request for Action Filed

Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:

11/17/2021: Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:

Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:

11/17/2021: Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialVasquez, Stephanie; Fee Waiver; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialVasquez, Stephanie; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialVazquez, Isaias, Jr.; Fee Waiver; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialVazquez, Isaias, Jr.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:; Comment: Isaias Vazquez Sr. is appointed as guardian ad litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:; Comment: Isaias Vazquez Sr. is appointed as guardian ad litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Action Filed; Comment: re: Fee Waiver submitted by GAL Isaias Vazquez Sr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialJuarez, Isabel; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialVasquez, Stephanie; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialVazquez, Isaias, Jr.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialJuarez, Isabel; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMBER HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant