This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 14:09:51 (UTC).

JOY MALONE-HELBLEY -v- SAMUEL HELBLEY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 JOY MALONE-HELBLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAMUEL HELBLEY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schumann, Tam Nomoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2412

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

Judge Details

Judge

Schumann, Tam Nomoto

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALONE-HELBLEY, JOY A

Respondent

HELBLEY, SAMUEL R

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $0.22; Total Payments and Credits: $0.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued; Comment: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAmended Family Law Petition Filed; Comment: 1ST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDocument(s) Placed in File; Comment: social security admin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS: FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketIncome Withholding for Support Filed; Comment: INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDefault Department Changed; Comment: DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S52 TO S44. TO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketFindings & Order After Hearing Filed; Comment: FINDING & ORDER AFTER HEARING; HEARING DATE: 05/17/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20170621-0172; ConversionPayment; $0.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $0.22

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOY A MALONE-HELBLEY IS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOY A MALONE-HELBLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication or Posting of; Comment: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMONS/PETITION/RFO FILED BY JOY A MALONE-HELBLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCommunity and Quasi Community Property Declaration Filed; Comment: COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JOY A MALONE-HELBLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed; Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOY A MALONE-HELBLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant