This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 10:23:07 (UTC).

John Deere Construction & Forestry Company, a corporation -v- Arrdu Construction, LLC a limited liability company et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 John Deere Construction Forestry Company, a corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arrdu Construction, LLC a limited liability company. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9276

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Deere Construction & Forestry Company, a corporation

Defendants

Sandu, Alexandrina Alice

Arrendondo, Peter Allen, Jr

Does 1-10

Arrdu Construction, LLC a limited liability company

an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DUNNING LAW FIRM

Attorney at THE DUNNING LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

Amended Summons Issued and Filed

06/14/2021: Amended Summons Issued and Filed

Amended Summons Issued and Filed

06/02/2021: Amended Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

04/27/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

04/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

03/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

03/19/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: 2nd amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: 1st amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialJohn Deere Construction & Forestry Company, a corporation; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-22216; ProVest California LLC4520 Seedling CirTampa, FL 33614; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialJohn Deere Construction & Forestry Company, a corporation; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialJohn Deere Construction & Forestry Company, a corporation; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRDU Construction LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN DEERE CONSTRUCTION & FORESTRY COMPANY is a litigant