This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 18:08:11 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE JOHN CHARLES HOLLINGSWORTH

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE JOHN CHARLES HOLLINGSWORTH was filed as a Not Yet Classified lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Reilly, Tara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0117

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Reilly, Tara

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHRISTOPHER MANACK

GINI THOMPSON

THOMPSON, GINI

MANACK, CHRISTOPHER

Other

JOHN CHARLESHOLLINGSWORTH TRUST

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CALDWELL, KENNEDY & PORTER

Attorney at Caldwell, Kennedy & Porter

15476 West Sand Avenue

Victorville, CA 92392

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Filed

06/16/2021: Notice of Hearing Filed

Order Filed Re:

06/07/2021: Order Filed Re:

**PR - Portal Minute Order

06/07/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

Order Filed Re:

05/26/2021: Order Filed Re:

**PR - Portal Minute Order

05/17/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

05/13/2021: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

EX PARTE PETITION FOR- 1) RETURN OF PROPERTY ETC F

05/13/2021: EX PARTE PETITION FOR- 1) RETURN OF PROPERTY ETC F

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Pr.C. 850 Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed; Comment: 08/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER DISSOLVING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Re:; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Receipt of Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialTHOMPSON, GINI; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0004302; THOMPSON, GINI; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialTHOMPSON, GINI; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: EX PARTE HEARING RE: PETITION FOR: 1) RETURN OF PROPERTY ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE HEARING RE: PETITION FOR: 1) RETURN OF PROPERTY ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialTHOMPSON, GINI; Total Financial Assessment: $41.00; Total Payments and Credits: $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY GINI THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER MANACK FOR EXPARTE PETITION 210513-0054-CK PBG/ 435.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210513-0054-CK SPP/ 60.00 PAYMT 210513-0054-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 23512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComment:; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 5/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComment:; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 5/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Filed Re:; Comment: EX PARTE PETITION FOR: 1) RETURN OF PROPERTY ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Probate); Comment: PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketConversion event; Comment: 0001 - ET PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant