Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 12:39:11 (UTC).

In the Matter of: John Cunningham

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 In the Matter of John Cunningham was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tavill, Gregory S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tavill, Gregory S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cunningham, John Lee

Defendant

: John Cunningham

Respondent

People of the State of CA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Hriciga, Valerie

HABEAS CORPUS RESOURCE CENTER

Respondent Attorneys

ATTORNEY GENERAL

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

**MH/WHC - Portal Minute Order

05/25/2021: **MH/WHC - Portal Minute Order

Reply Filed

03/29/2021: Reply Filed

Informal Response Filed

03/29/2021: Informal Response Filed

Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

03/29/2021: Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

Application for

03/29/2021: Application for

Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

03/29/2021: Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

03/29/2021: Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

03/29/2021: Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

03/29/2021: Exhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus

Amended Petition Filed

03/29/2021: Amended Petition Filed

Amended Petition Filed

03/29/2021: Amended Petition Filed

Letter Filed

03/29/2021: Letter Filed

Capital Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed

03/29/2021: Capital Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed

Letter Filed

03/26/2021: Letter Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketExtension of Time to Rule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketExtension of Time to Rule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourts Motion to Extend Time (WHC); Judicial Officer: Tavill, Gregory S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCapital Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed and Mailed to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Filed; Comment: reply to the informal response to amended petition for writ of habeas corpus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Response Filed; Comment: to amended petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus; Comment: exhibit 18

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus; Comment: Exhibits 14-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus; Comment: Exhibits 10-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus; Comment: Exhibits 5-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits Filed on Writ of Habeas Corpus; Comment: Exhibits 1-4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed; Comment: 2 of 2; Continuance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed; Comment: 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Filed; Comment: By Supreme Court; CD attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapital Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketWrit of Habeas Corpus Petition Assigned to:; Judicial Officer: Tavill, Gregory S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Filed; Comment: letter from Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant