This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 18:27:03 (UTC).

Hagan -v- General Motors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Hagan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Williams, David A and Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8646

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Williams, David A

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hagan, Michael H

an individual

Defendants

General Motors LLC

a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ADAM ZOLONZ APC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ADAM ZOLONZ APC

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/28/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

07/14/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

07/06/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/30/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/30/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

06/30/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Duplicate filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Michael H. Hagan server Defendant General Motors on 071321 on complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialHagan, Michael H; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-39495; Adam Zolonz; $453.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialHagan, Michael H; Transaction Assessment; $18.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialHagan, Michael H; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialHagan, Michael H; Total Financial Assessment: $453.77; Total Payments and Credits: $453.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $18.77 vs paid on 07/06/21 for Postage/Copies/Fax

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 vs paid on 07/06/21 for First Appearance Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant