This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/22/2021 at 18:06:17 (UTC).

GRIFFEY -v- MISSION LANE LLC

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 GRIFFEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MISSION LANE LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keh, Winston. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1666

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keh, Winston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIFFEY, THOMAS

Defendants

MISSION LANE LLC

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

 

Court Documents

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

08/18/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

08/18/2021: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

08/16/2021: REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

08/16/2021: REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

Challenge of Venue Filed

08/09/2021: Challenge of Venue Filed

Proof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

07/06/2021: Proof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

06/25/2021: Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

06/23/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Keh, Winston; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution - Before Hearing (SC); Party; Comment; Comment: (On Plaintiff's Claim Judgment/Disposition entered on 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase ordered dismissed in its Entirety; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Keh, Winston; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $1500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: DISMISSAL IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON- 1B OF THE DISMISSAL IS REQUIRED TO PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDocument(s) Placed in File; Comment: CHALLENGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChallenge of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: CERT MAIL CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialGRIFFEY, THOMAS; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0016097; GRIFFEY, THOMAS; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialGRIFFEY, THOMAS; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0016096; GRIFFEY, THOMAS; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialGRIFFEY, THOMAS; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialGRIFFEY, THOMAS; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: TRACKING# 7013 1710 0001 7638 8742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialGRIFFEY, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff <$1500 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant