This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 03:20:02 (UTC).

Grey et al -v- Billings et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Grey filed an Other lawsuit against Billings. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet M Frangie and Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3049

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Janet M Frangie

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grey, Carmen R

Live Oak Drive, LLC

A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILTY COMPANY

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Billings, Karl H

Dearborn Properties, LLC

Lindenwood, LLC

The Karl Billings Living Trust

The Karl H. and Karn B. Billings Trust

Unionbancal Mortage Corporation

MUFG Union Bank, N.A.

First Team Commerical Real Estate

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE GENERAL MANANGER OF DEARBORN PROPERTIES, LLC

A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILTY COMPANY

DATED JUNE 21, 2005

DATED OCTOBER 28, 2020

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

Coombs, Lauren J

All persons having or claiming interests of record, unknown or actually known to the plaintiffs, or reasonably apparent from an inspection of the property, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the propert describ

Does 1-100 Inclusive

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burns, Dennis David

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: Complaint filed by plaintiff Carmen R. Grey and Live Oak Drive, LLC on 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-74121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Carmen Grey, Live Oak Drive, LLC; Comments: $435 check paid by plaintiff for first apperance fees.Paid on 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Carmen Grey, Live Oak Drive, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFile Type: No Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: Carmen Grey, Live Oak Drive, LLC; Comments: Summons attachment page (SUM-200a) must be submitted when there are additional parties that do not fit on summons (SUM-100). Please resubmit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less