This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 18:07:32 (UTC).

GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC -v- ZUMWALT

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZUMWALT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halgrimson, Carrie, Lough, Daniel C. and Mann, Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1287

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halgrimson, Carrie

Lough, Daniel C.

Mann, Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC

Defendant

ZUMWALT, SANDRA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear Filed

07/06/2021: Authorization to Appear Filed

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

07/06/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

07/06/2021: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

07/06/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

06/01/2021: Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

Clerk's Notice of Hearing

05/25/2021: Clerk's Notice of Hearing

Clerk's Notice of Hearing

05/25/2021: Clerk's Notice of Hearing

Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

05/17/2021: Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/17/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/17/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Halgrimson, Carrie; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Mann, Douglas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed; Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0012291; GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC is a litigant