This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 18:07:55 (UTC).

GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC -v- MCDONALD

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCDONALD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC

Defendant

MCDONALD, SEAN BRYAN

 

Court Documents

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

07/16/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

07/16/2021: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

07/16/2021: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

05/19/2021: Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/19/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/19/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - After Hearing (Uncontested); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Awarded Against: MCDONALD, SEAN BRYAN; Amount; Costs: $70.00; Other: $250.00; Total: $320.00; Party; Comment; Comment: (On plaintiff's claim, default judgment entered on 7/16/2021.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial proceeds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0012818; GRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialGRAHAM-NEWMAN, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC is a litigant