This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 18:19:54 (UTC).

Gonzalez et al -v- Big T Auto, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Gonzalez filed an Other lawsuit against Big T Auto, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6137

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gonzalez, Robert

Gonzalez, Nancy

An Individual

Defendants

Big T Auto, LLC

M&N Financing Corporation

DOES 1-75

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP

Attorney at ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP

M&N Financing Corporation

Attorney at M&N Financing Corporation

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

06/09/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/09/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Miscellaneous Document Filed

06/09/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

06/09/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Consent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed

06/09/2021: Consent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed

Statement of Damages Filed

06/09/2021: Statement of Damages Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

06/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/15/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Answer Filed

07/07/2021: Answer Filed

Proof of Service Filed

07/07/2021: Proof of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialM&N Financing Corporation; Turbo Court; Receipt # SC-2021-40178; M&N Financing Corporation; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialM&N Financing Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 turbocourt payment paid on 07/08/2021 for first appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: of answer by electronic service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialGonzalez, Robert; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-35588; Gonzalez, Robert; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialGonzalez, Robert; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 06/09/21 for COmplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialM&N Financing Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialGonzalez, Robert; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Damages Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: Affidavit of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: Affidavit of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant