This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 16:39:42 (UTC).

Gary E. Looney -v- Chiguacle Corp., A California Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Gary E Looney filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chiguacle Corp , A California Corporation. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Williams, David A and Barry L. Plotkin, Michael M. Dest. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1559

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Williams, David A

Barry L. Plotkin, Michael M. Dest

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary E. Looney

Collectronics of California

Defendants

Chiguacle Corp., A California Corporation

DOES 1-10

Arellano, Alonso Ramiro

Chiguacle Sabor Ancestral De Mexico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Looney, Gary E

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

04/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

04/23/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Complaint Filed

04/23/2021: Complaint Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

04/23/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

07/23/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Judicial Officer: Williams, David A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; Gary E. Looney; Chiguacle Corp., A California Corporation; Arellano, Alonso Ramiro; DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialGary E. Looney; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-26726; Gary E. Looney; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialGary E. Looney; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialGary E. Looney; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $240 check pd on 05/11/21 for first appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collectronics of California is a litigant