This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:18:14 (UTC).

Falcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC -v- Lights of America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Falcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Lights of America, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5383

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Falcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC

A Delaware Limited Liability Companu

Respondents

Lights of America, Inc

A California Corporation

Everest National Insurance Company

Mir, Javid

McMaster-Carr

Great America Financial Service

Pacific Coast Propane, LLC

Valley Vista Services

Safeguard Business Systems

Anaheim Wire Products

The Sherwin Williams Co

American Express

RFE International, Inc

McKinney Socal

Perez, Miguel M

Pena, Robert

CAO Lighting Inc

Vending One, Inc

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

RICHARD L SEIDE

Gross, Barbara R

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

10/01/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

10/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

10/01/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

10/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

10/01/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Miscellaneous Document Filed

10/20/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Objection Filed

10/26/2021: Objection Filed

Response Filed to:

11/08/2021: Response Filed to:

Proof of Service Filed

11/08/2021: Proof of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialEverest National Insurance Company; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-66638; Gross, Barbara R; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialEverest National Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 ck paid on 11/19/21 for first app fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: Everest Nat'l Ins Co's Response to Interpleader Complaint served by mail on 11/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse Filed to:; Comment: Interpleader Complaint; filed by Rep Evergreen Nat'l Ins Co on 11/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFalcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-62637; Falcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; $6.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFalcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; Transaction Assessment; $6.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection Filed; Comment: Specially appearing interested party, The Estate of Usman Vakil's objection to plaintiff's Notice of Levy. filed by the Estate of Usman Vakil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $6.30 visa paid on 10/29/21 for fax fees/copies/e&p

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialEverest National Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFalcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-57240; Falcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFalcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFalcon Industrial SPE Financed Portfolio LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $441.30; Total Payments and Credits: $441.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 10/01/21 for First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY VISTA SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where McMaster-Carr is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where VENDING ONE INC is a litigant