This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 18:31:07 (UTC).

Estate of: MARIA ANAYA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Estate of MARIA ANAYA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reichert, Stanford E and Nassar, William. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0732

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reichert, Stanford E

Nassar, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELES, FRANCISCO

Decedent

ANAYA, MARIA DELMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Noel, Nancy

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Assignment Received

10/04/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Initial Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition Filed

10/04/2021: Initial Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition Filed

Declaration Filed

10/04/2021: Declaration Filed

Notice of Return of Document(s)

10/06/2021: Notice of Return of Document(s)

Notice of Hearing Filed

11/18/2021: Notice of Hearing Filed

Examiner Notes - 1st Check

11/24/2021: Examiner Notes - 1st Check

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed

11/24/2021: Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed

Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed

11/24/2021: Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialANGELES, FRANCISCO; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0015399; Noel, Nancy; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialANGELES, FRANCISCO; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition; Judicial Officer: Nassar, William; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed; Comment: 11/24/21 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialANGELES, FRANCISCO; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0011780; ANGELES, FRANCISCO; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialANGELES, FRANCISCO; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialANGELES, FRANCISCO; Total Financial Assessment: $506.00; Total Payments and Credits: $506.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLATAION OF SPOUSAL PETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Noel