This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 09:48:57 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JAMES W. CLARKSON, SR

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 ESTATE OF JAMES W CLARKSON, SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reilly, Tara and Tara Reilly. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reilly, Tara

Tara Reilly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARKSON, MARTHA A

Not Yet Classified

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Decedents

CLARKSON, JAMES WINANS

CLARKSON Sr., JAMES W

Other and Not Classified By Court

BENSING, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Daniel, Jennifer Michele

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Szachowicz, Phillip J

Greco, David G

RMO LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

* Public *

Notice of Return of Document(s)

* Public *

Notice of Entry of Judgment

* Public *

Ordr Granting Attys Mtn to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

* Public *

Order Filed Re:

Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed

Stipulation & Order

Proof of Service

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

* Public *

Dec in Support of Atty's Mtn to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

* Public *

Stipulation & Order filed

* Public *

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice Filed

* Public *

Reply Filed

* Public *

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Returned Mail Received from Postal Service; Filed By: MARY BENSING; Comments: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1676.00; Payment: $1676.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $12.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SB-2022-0017589

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $12.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: FAX - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice Filed; Filed By: MARY BENSING; Comments: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN BY FORMER COUNSEL FOR MARY BENSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: Phillip Szachowicz; Comments: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN IS RETURNED, PAYMENT INFORMATION MISSING ON MC-005. PLEASE RE-SUBMIT WITH PAYMENT FOR FAX FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Filed By: David Greco; Comments: VIA FAX: NOTICE OF ATTTY LIEN BY FORMER COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $7.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SB-2022-0016382

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $7.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $465.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: 20210205-0073

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $465.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes; Comments: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Statement of Birth Date and DL Filed; Comments: CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Comments: FILING FEE PAID BY MARTHA A CLARKSON FOR PETITION FEE 210205-0073-CK PBG/ 435.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210205-0073-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 149

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Conversion event; Comments: 0001 - PP PETITION FOR PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Petition and Party Information Entered (Probate); Comments: PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Petition Filed; Comments: PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed; Comments: DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARTHA A CLARKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less