This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 18:15:28 (UTC).

Espino -v- California Department of Transportation

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Espino filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against California Department of Transportation. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, James R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0869

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, James R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Espino, Xochil

Defendants

California Department of Transportation

Resendez, Blas

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

12/22/2021: Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

12/22/2021: Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

12/22/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

02/18/2022: Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Baxter, James R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed; Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketComment:; Comment: SEALED COPY OF FEE WAIVER ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF FOR SERVICE BY SHERIFF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDocuments Received:; Comment: CONFORMED COPY OF FEE WAIVER REQUEST VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant