This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 18:06:09 (UTC).

ENDOWMENT FUND FBO SALVATION ARMY OF SB

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 ENDOWMENT FUND FBO SALVATION ARMY OF SB was filed as a Not Yet Classified lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilleece, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0114

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Gilleece, Michelle

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WILFRID C. LEMANN

LEMANN, WILFRID C

Others

ENDOWMENT FUND FBOSALVATION ARMY OF

ENDOWMENT FUND FBO SALVATION ARMY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DAVISON, ARIC M

215 North D Street First Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

Davison, Aric Michael

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Filed

05/28/2021: Notice of Hearing Filed

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

05/12/2021: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE- FOR ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTE

05/12/2021: PETITION RE- FOR ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: PETITION FOR FOR ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gilleece, Michelle; Hearing Time: 09:05 AM; Comment: PETITION FOR FOR ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed; Comment: 08/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20210513-0011; ConversionPayment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $465.00; Total Payments and Credits: $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY WILFRID C. LEMANN FOR TRUST PETITION 210513-0011-CK PBG/ 435.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210513-0011-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 82858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed; Comment: PETITION RE: FOR ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Probate); Comment: PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketConversion event; Comment: 0001 - ET PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aric Michael Davison