This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 08:20:27 (UTC).

Diggs -v- CPLG Management L.L.C.et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Diggs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CPLG Management L L C. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5204

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diggs, Desiree

Defendants

LQ Management L.L.C

La Quinta Inn & Suites by Wyndham

CPLG Management L.L.C

Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc

Helmsman Management Services, LLC

Doe 1

Does 2 through 50

LQ Management L.L.C dba La Quinta Inn & Suites by Wyndham

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN & GOLDSZER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN & GOLDSZER

Defendant Attorney

Snyder Burnett Egerer, LLP

Attorney at Snyder Burnett Egerer, LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

12/16/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Answer Filed

12/16/2021: Answer Filed

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

12/03/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

12/03/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

12/03/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

Trial Setting Order filed

12/03/2021: Trial Setting Order filed

Court Order Filed

12/03/2021: Court Order Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/03/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/29/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/29/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/24/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/24/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/24/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

06/03/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

05/27/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/27/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

05/27/2021: Complaint Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: / OSC re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialSnyder Burnett Egerer, LLP; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialLQ Management L.L.C; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-72290; LQ Management L.L.C; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialLQ Management L.L.C; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialHelmsman Management Services, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-72289; Helmsman Management Services, LLC; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialHelmsman Management Services, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialWyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-72288; Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialWyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCPLG Management L.L.C.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-72287; CPLG Management L.L.C.; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialLQ Management L.L.C; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialHelmsman Management Services, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialWyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCPLG Management L.L.C.; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialDiggs, Desiree; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 CK paid on 06/03/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON BEHALF OF ADP TOTALSOURCE FL XVI INC. / GLOBAL INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Kamla Hotels Inc; DBA : La Quinta Inn & Suites is a litigant

Latest cases where LQ MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. is a litigant