This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 05:22:53 (UTC).

Delgado-Lopez -v- In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Companyet al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Delgado-Lopez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5532

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delgado-Lopez, Erika

Defendants

In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

In-Shape Holdings, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ewaniszyk Law Firm

Attorney at Ewaniszyk Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER& LOWARY LLP

Attorney at BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER& LOWARY LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

02/19/2021: Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

02/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

02/19/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

02/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

02/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

02/19/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Answer Filed

06/04/2021: Answer Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

06/04/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

07/09/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

09/10/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

09/16/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

09/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Civil Mediation Session; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: filed by plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: filed by Defendant on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Erika Delgado-Lopez on Complaint filed 2/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialIn-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33861; USA Legal Network Worldwide Legal Group; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialIn-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialIn-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialDelgado-Lopez, Erika; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialIn-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialDelgado-Lopez, Erika; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent; Comment: TSC set for 9.29.2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check paid on 3.29.2021 for 1st app fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant