This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 18:14:09 (UTC).

De Los Angeles Rodriguez et al -v- Godoy et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 De Los Angeles Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Godoy. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4504

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

De Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria

Haro, Alondra

Defendants

Godoy, Drema

Desert Valley Hospital

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Timothy A McDonough

Attorney at Law Offices of Timothy A McDonough

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

05/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

05/19/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/19/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

05/19/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialDe Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; Counter Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33031; De Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialDe Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $150.00 check paid on 6/4/21 for advanced jury fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fees Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialDe Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-31463; Info Track US, Inc; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialDe Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialDe Los Angeles Rodriguez, Maria; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 ck paid on 05/28/21 for First Appearance Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL is a litigant