This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 21:30:48 (UTC).

Darden -v- California Force et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Darden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against California Force. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Apaloo, Khymberli S and Khymberli S Apaloo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5625

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Apaloo, Khymberli S

Khymberli S Apaloo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darden, Jerome Hadded

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

California Force

Cali Cutz

Waterman Discount Mall

Briggs, Larry Louell

Waterman Management, Inc.

Does 5 to 75

Diab, Ziad

DZ Property Managment, Inc.

Choi, Jack

California Force Patrol, Inc.

Roes 1 thrpugh 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE VARTAZARIAN LAW FIRM

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC

PETIT KOHN INCRASSIA & LUTZ PC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

* Public *

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2022

HearingType: Further Trial Setting Conference: Dismissal of Unserved Def/ Status of Cross Complaint; Department: Department S25 - SBJC; Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1194.00; Payment: $1194.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $154.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-40228

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $4.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Jerome Darden; Comments: Filed by Plaintiff Jerome Haddad Darden, served as to Defendant California Force, served on 06/17/22, on Complaint filed 03/10/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Waterman Management, Inc.; Comments: Filed by plantiff Waterman Discount Mall et al served defendant California Force Patrol, Inc. served 06/17/2022 on cross-complaint filed 06/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference: (Further); Department: Department S25 - SBJC; Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022

DocketFile Type: Party appeared by audio and/or video

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: Jerome Darden; Comments: (proposed order) re; plaintiffs Notice of Errata; missing Notice of Errata

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: THE VARTAZARIAN LAW FIRM; Comments: the notice of errata needs an order to be submitted to change the name and $20.00 for the order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-15349

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: Complaint filed by pla Jerome Haddad Darden on 3/10/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Comments: $435.00 ck paid on 3/25/21 for 1st paper fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Jerome Darden

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less