This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 19:18:34 (UTC).

Dains -v- Office Depot, Inc.et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Dains filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Office Depot, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8576

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dains, Shirley A

Defendants

Office Depot, Inc

DOES 1 to 15,inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCune Wright Arevelo LLP

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevelo LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

06/22/2021: Complaint Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/22/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

07/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

07/07/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

08/11/2021: Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

08/16/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

08/17/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons: Party served in 3a must match EXACTLY as named in the Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUnserved; Return Unserved: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons received 08/12/21: Name in #3a must match Complaint exactly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialDains, Shirley A; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-39824; McCune Wright Arevelo LLP; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialDains, Shirley A; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialDains, Shirley A; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check paid 7/7/2021 for filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant