This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 21:58:14 (UTC).

Credigy Receivables Inc. -v- Morales

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Credigy Receivables Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Morales. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald J Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7187

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald J Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credigy Receivables Inc.

Defendant

Morales, Juan A

Assignees

Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC

a Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

* Public *

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: Cost: $149.00 / Credits $ 0.00 / Interest $502.97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Credigy Receivables Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $86.00; Payment: $86.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $41.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $41.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action; Description: Original Judgment Entered 06/26/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Certified Copy Purchased. Number of Pages:; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comments: CIVDS1207602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: $86.00 ck's paid on 06/22/21 for renewal fee/certified copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: Interest:$3867.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less