This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:22:00 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO v ROSS V VARONE

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROSS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fuertsch, Charles M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2406

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fuertsch, Charles M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Defendant

VARONE, ROSS V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Attorney at DEPT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Defendant Attorney

Zitney, jonathon A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketService Tab Updated; Comment: ANSWER FILED 12-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialVARONE, ROSS V; Fax Filing; Receipt # CS-2021-00967; VARONE, ROSS V; $8.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialVARONE, ROSS V; Transaction Assessment; $8.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint or Supplemental Filed (Governmental)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialVARONE, ROSS V; Total Financial Assessment: $8.29; Total Payments and Credits: $8.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued - Electronically Filed with Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketGovernmental Summons & Complaint Filed; Comment: Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZITNEY JONATHON ANDREW