This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/08/2022 at 09:17:46 (UTC).

Corner -v- Southwire Company LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Corner filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Southwire Company LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2685

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corner, Brevious

Defendants

Southwire Company LLC

Does 1 through 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Freiman & Freiman

Attorney at Freiman & Freiman

Defendant Attorney

Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

11/24/2021: Notice Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

11/18/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

11/03/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Notice Filed

10/29/2021: Notice Filed

Amended Complaint Filed

10/06/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

09/16/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

09/14/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed

09/07/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed

Notice Filed

09/07/2021: Notice Filed

Declaration re:

08/09/2021: Declaration re:

Demurrer Filed

08/09/2021: Demurrer Filed

Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer

08/02/2021: Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/14/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

05/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

05/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

04/30/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

04/30/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

04/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: /OSC Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff's Counsel Failure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Continued Trial Setting Conference and Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: Filed by Defendant Southwire Company, LLC on Amended Complaint filed 10/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint filed by Pla Corner, against Def Southwire Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: Sustaining defendant Southwire Company, LLC's demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketLeave of Court Granted for; Comment: Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Demurrer filed by defendant Southwire Company , LLC 8/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialCorner, Brevious; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-28297; ace attorney; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialCorner, Brevious; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialSouthwire Company LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialCorner, Brevious; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 CK paid on 05/18/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southwire Company, LLC is a litigant