This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 20:49:04 (UTC).

Conservatorship of BARRY SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Conservatorship of BARRY SMITH was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Reichert, Stanford E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0202

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Reichert, Stanford E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, RHONDA

Conservatee

SMITH, BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sheasby, Matthew Edward

Conservatee Attorneys

Moore, Walter Thomas

Parker, Craig Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketConservatorship Investigator Review Re: Annual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Conservatorship; Judicial Officer: Reichert, Stanford E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEx Parte App for Order Auth Completn of Capacity Dec - HIPAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCourt Investigator's Report Filed (Confidential); Comment: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed; Comment: 04/04/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketLetters Issued - Temporary; Comment: PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCourt Investigator fees waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCopy Cert of Completion:Conservator Ed Course Placed in File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialSheasby, Matthew Edward; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0013587; Sheasby, Matthew Edward; $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotification to Court of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCourt Investigators Referral Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketInitial Petition for Appointment of Conservator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed; Comment: of Handbook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketList of Required Contact Information for Conservatorships; Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE WALTER THOMAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER, CRAIG M