This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2021 at 18:12:14 (UTC).

Connect by American Family -v- Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Connect by American Family filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6680

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connect by American Family

Defendants

Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD

A California Limited Partnership

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON | SCHWARTZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

07/02/2021: Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

Summons Issued and Filed

06/17/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

06/11/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/11/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

06/11/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketUnserved; Served: 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:; Comment: Filed by plaintiff Connect by American Family; unserved defendant Robertson's Ready Mix. LTD a California Limited Partnership c/o Ct corporation system on complaint filed 06/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialConnect by American Family; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-36392; abc legal; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialConnect by American Family; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialConnect by American Family; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $240 check paid on 06/17/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a California Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONNECT BY AMERICAN FAMILY is a litigant