This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 12:31:51 (UTC).

*COMPLEX/CLASS ACTION*Ordaz -v- Mclane/Suneast et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 COMPLEX/CLASS ACTION Ordaz filed an Other lawsuit against Mclane/Suneast. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8567

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ordaz, Jose

on behalf of himself, all others similarly situated, and the general public

Defendants

Mclane Foodservice Distribution, Inc

Mclane Foodservice, Inc

Mclane/Suneast, Inc

Mclane Company, Inc

Mclane Beverage Distribution, Inc

a Texas corporation

Does 1-50

a North Carolina corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

United Employees Law Group

Attorney at United Employees Law Group

The Spivak Law Firm

Attorney at The Spivak Law Firm

 

Court Documents

Request to Continue Court Hearing Filed

06/18/2021: Request to Continue Court Hearing Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

06/11/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

05/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

05/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

05/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/23/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Order Filed Re:

04/23/2021: Order Filed Re:

Summons Issued and Filed

04/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/29/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Certificate of Assignment Received

03/29/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Complaint Filed

03/29/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing Filed; Comment: Request and order to continue case management conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-35600; Rapid Legal; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-35595; Rapid Legal; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $150.00 check paid on 6/15/21 for jury fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $20.00 check paid 6/15/21 for stipulation and order to continue fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-20899; rapid legal; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-20898; rapid legal; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialOrdaz, Jose; Total Financial Assessment: $1,605.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $1435.00 CK's paid on 04/21/21 for class action/complex/first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a North Carolina corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where A TEXAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where McLane/Suneast, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC. is a litigant