This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 23:30:58 (UTC).

*COMPLEX* Westport -v- San Manuel et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 COMPLEX Westport filed an Other lawsuit against San Manuel. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cohn, David, Frangie, Janet M and Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5535

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cohn, David

Frangie, Janet M

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westport Insurance Corporation

Defendants

San Manuel Band of Mission Indians

Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy Nos. PTNAM1901045, PTNAM1903486, and PTNAM1902551

Certain Underwriters al LLoyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy Nos. PTNAM1901055 and PTNAM1903490

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Western World Insurance Company

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

Allied World National Insurance Company

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

Homeland Insurance Company of New York

Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Tokyo Marine America Insurance Company

Landmark American Insurance Company

Princeton Excess And Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company

a Nebraska corporation

San Manuel Indian Bingo and Casino

a New Hampshire Corporation

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DLA Piper LLP

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

DLA PIPER LLP (US)

Defendant Attorneys

Latham & Watkins LLP

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

 

Court Documents

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

06/11/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

06/11/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

06/11/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

06/11/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

06/11/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed

06/11/2021: Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed

**Portal Minute Order

06/11/2021: **Portal Minute Order

General Appearance Filed

06/04/2021: General Appearance Filed

Proof of Service Filed

06/04/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6

06/04/2021: Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6

Notice Filed

06/04/2021: Notice Filed

Case Management Conference Statement Filed

06/01/2021: Case Management Conference Statement Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/02/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Order Re: Filed

04/02/2021: Order Re: Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

02/10/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

02/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

02/10/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint Filed

02/10/2021: Complaint Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: OSC re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve Remaining Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: *COURTESY COPY* of notice of related case CIV SB2106759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of Minute Order and Notice/Order Re: CCP 170.6 dated 6/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCCP 170.6 Motion - Affidavit of Prejudice; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialTokyo Marine America Insurance Company; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33981; ASAP Legal, LLC; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialTokyo Marine America Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialTokyo Marine America Insurance Company; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33979; ASAP Legal, LLC; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialTokyo Marine America Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialSan Manuel Band of Mission Indians; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33873; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • FinancialWestport Insurance Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • FinancialWestport Insurance Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialTokyo Marine America Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialSan Manuel Band of Mission Indians; Total Financial Assessment: $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialWestport Insurance Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $1435.00 Ck paid on 03/24/21 for complex fees/first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITEERS AT LLOYDS LONDON WHO SUBSCRIBE TO POLICY NO. DCCS GL 02319-01 WITH UNIQUE MARKET REFERENCE BL392BWI176006 is a litigant

Latest cases where ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK is a litigant

Latest cases where CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant