This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 06:26:42 (UTC).

**COMPLEX-CLASS ACTION** Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc. -V- County of San Bernardino

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 COMPLEX-CLASS ACTION Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against County of San Bernardino. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David Cohn and Cohn, David. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9854

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

David Cohn

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Old Spaghetti Factory

Redlands, LLC

Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc.

OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY,INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

Defendants

County of San Bernardino

County of San Bernardino Department of Public Health

California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control

DOES 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kabateck LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Loeb & Loeb LLP

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Order Filed Re:

* Public *

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination of Add-On

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

General Appearance Filed

* Public *

Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service

* Public *

Proof of Service Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service Filed

* Public *

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/24/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Further Case Management Conference: Status of Coordination; Department: Department S26 - SBJC; Judge: Cohn, David; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketFile Type: Court Orders Matter Stayed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc., Redlands, LLC; Comments: Order assigning coordination tiral judge (JCCP) NO. 5108 Filed by Plaintiffs Filed on 11/18/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling Filed; Filed By: Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc.; Comments: Notice of ruling on petition for coordination Filed by ALL Plaintiffs filed on 10/12/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control; Comments: Department Of Alcoholic Beverage Control's response to petition for coordination. Filed by Defendant California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control on 8/26/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control; Comments: Notice of potential add-on cases for coordination Filed by Defendant California Department of Alcoholic Beerage Control on 8/26/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Comments: Notice of order assigning coordination mtoion judge and setting date for hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021
View Court Documents

HearingType: Complex Case Management Conference; Department: Department S26 - SBJC; Judge: Cohn, David; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Vega, Regina

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $2890.00; Payment: $1455.00; Credit: $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $20.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-42502

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
04/30/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $1000.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-23500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $1000.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 04/09/2021 complaint filed by Spaghetti Factory,Dariotis Group Restuarants, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc., Redlands, LLC; Comments: $1000.00 check paid on 4/30/2021 for Complec Case Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc., Redlands, LLC; Comments: $435.00 check paid on 4/30/2021 for first appearance fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Dariotis Group Restaurants, Inc., Redlands, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less